THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 20:34:12 PM
Mech, Zdislaw Romuald
CPSO#:
15813
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: University of Toronto, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 10 Sep 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1961 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1956 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 11 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Sep 2015 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: September 15, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective September 15, 2015, Dr. Mech has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.