Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Sep 2000
Summary:
On September 19, 2000, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Anderson guilty of professional misconduct for failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession particularly in respect of repeat prescriptions of drugs. The Committee found Dr. Anderson not guilty of the remaining allegations against him.
On January 29, 2001 the Discipline Committee ordered the following:
Dr. Anderson be reprimanded and that the reprimand be recorded on the Register.
Dr. Anderson’s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of six months, to become effective February 1, 2001, all of which will be suspended if Dr. Anderson fulfills the following six conditions:
-In the event Dr. Anderson breaches or fails to fulfill any one of the forgoing conditional of the suspension shall immediately become effective from the date the Registrar is notified of a breach of the conditions
-that he undergo PREP tailored to his medical practice (excluding paediatrics and obstetrics) at his own expense and abide by any of its restrictions or recommendations;
-that he undergo a medical record-keeping course at his own expense and abide by any recommendations of that course;
-that he maintain a narcotics dispensing log in respect of any and all narcotic prescriptions;
-that he abide by the Alberta Guidelines on narcotic prescribing;
-that he submit to a Quality Assurance Assessment one year after completing the narcotics prescribing and medical record-keeping courses;
-that he pay the College costs fixed at $1,000. on or before February 28, 2001.
At the hearing, Dr. Anderson through his counsel, undertook not to prescribe narcotics in his general practice including, Seconal, Percocet, Percodan, or Talwin and only to prescribe such drugs in connection with his surgical practice for a limited duration following surgery. The Committee accepts that undertaking and expects Dr. Anderson to abide by it.
On September 25, 2002, the Divisional Court, on reading the consent of the parties, filed, ordered that Dr. Anderson's appeal, of the decision and reasons of the Discipline Committee dated September 19, 2000 and the oral decision and reasons of January 29, 2001, be allowed and that the finding of professional misconduct made by the Discipline Committee be set aside.
Appeal: Decision Overruled
Appeal Decision Date: 2002-09-25
Hearing Date(s): 05 Oct 1999
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Aug 1985
Summary:
In August 1985, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Anderson guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Anderson's licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1987-01-22
Hearing Date(s): 19 Aug 1985