THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:27:31 AM
Alikhassi Habibabadi, Afsaneh
CPSO#:
122241
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Sep 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Shahid Beheshti University of Medical Sc, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
Department of Medical Imaging, M6
Room 261
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: (416) 480-5266
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:23 Sep 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2022 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 22 Sep 2029 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Sep 2022 |
|
Active |