THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:53:21 AM
Montazeralghaem, Douna
CPSO#:
120750
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Jul 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph & Wild Lebovic Health Comple
1-60 Murray St
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:21 Jul 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 May 2020 to 30 Apr 2021
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 May 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Nov 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Nov 2022 |
|
Active |