THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:00:05 AM
Iraji, Sasan
CPSO#:
120300
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Dec 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Mar 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Bushehr University of Medical Sciences, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
935 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 2T7
Phone: 416-635-6060
Fax: 416-764-5620
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Feb 2020 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SASAN IRAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRAJI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Dec 2019 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 03 Jun 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2021 |