THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:37:58 AM
Azadeh, Manizheh
CPSO#:
118476
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Feb 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Feb 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Azari, English, Farsi
Education: Tabriz University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
304-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Phone: (519)578-3500
Fax: 519-741-0286
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran
Newfoundland and Labrador
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Dec 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANIZHEH AZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZADEH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Feb 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2020 |