THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:21:20 AM
Omid-Fard, Nima
CPSO#:
118444
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education
as of
01 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2019
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department Of Diagnostic Radiology
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 14054
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NIMA OMID-FARD shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. OMID-FARD is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;
(2) Dr. OMID-FARD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. OMID-FARD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. OMID-FARD shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. OMID-FARD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. OMID-FARD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2024.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |