THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:32:10 PM
Yazdanpanah Fadaee, Maryam Fakhrieh
CPSO#:
117510
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Feb 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jan 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Persian
Education: Islamic Azad University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Ave.
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 936 4628
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Aug 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARYAM FAKHRIEH YAZDANPANAH FADAEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAZDANPANAH FADAEE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Feb 2019 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Feb 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2021 |