THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 13:50:28 PM
Khakpour, Ali
CPSO#:
116525
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Feb 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Feb 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tabriz University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 130
5 Park Home Ave.
North York ON M3A 1Z4
Phone: (416)5512023
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: KHAKPOUR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 17 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALI KHAKPOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAKPOUR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jul 2018 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 04 Jul 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jul 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Feb 2019 |