THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:01:54 AM
Vaez-Zadeh, Arash
CPSO#:
115952
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Feb 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5-9080 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 0Y7
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2021 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARASH VAEZ-ZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAEZ-ZADEH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 23 Sep 2018
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2022 |