THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 22:48:41 PM
Azizi Namini, Parastoo
CPSO#:
115851
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Feb 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Feb 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: University of Kentucky, 2018
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
418 Eglinton Ave W
Unit 200
Toronto ON M5N 1A2
Phone: 647.479.8410
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2020 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PARASTOO AZIZI NAMINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZI NAMINI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2021 |