THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:02:27 PM
Fatima, Safoora
CPSO#:
115482
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education
as of
01 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2018
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON N6A 5C1
Phone: 5196612019
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAFOORA FATIMA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FATIMA is enrolled at WESTERN UNIVERSITY;
(2) Dr. FATIMA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FATIMA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. FATIMA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FATIMA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FATIMA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
Note: This certificate expires on 31 Dec 2024.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
Western University, 01 Jul 2022 to 04 Sep 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
Western University, 05 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
Western University, 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Western University, 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2024 |