THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:32:01 AM
Arbab-Tafti, Sadaf
CPSO#:
114982
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: University of Ottawa, 2018
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-220 Duncan Mill Rd
North York Doctors
North York ON M3B 3J5
Phone: (416) 494-7435
Fax: (416) 494-4819
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2020 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SADAF ARBAB-TAFTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARBAB-TAFTI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2020 |