THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 22:55:06 PM
Mirdamadi, Ali
CPSO#:
114451
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Feb 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
62-1262 Don Mills Rd
North York ON M3B 2W7
Phone: (416) 335-7474
Fax: (416) 332-8593
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pain Medicine |
Effective:05 Feb 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:02 Nov 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2018 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 04 Aug 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Nov 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2023 |
|
Active |