THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:09:24 PM
Chou, Chen-Yu Jennifer
CPSO#:
114245
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Sep 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: Queen's University, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
401-71 King St W
Mississauga ON L5B 4A2
Phone: 9052739793
Fax: 9052737054
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Dec 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHEN-YU JENNIFER CHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOU is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Dec 2017 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 17 Dec 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2022 |