THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:12:33 AM
Chatterjee, Ananda
CPSO#:
113909
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ananda Chatterjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Sep 2017 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 17 Mar 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Apr 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2019 |