THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 6:00:22 AM
Sajjadi Saravi, Majid
CPSO#:
113686
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Multi Care Clinic
14987 Yonge St,
Aurora ON L4G 1M5
Phone: 9055036100
Fax: 9055031000
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Oct 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAJID SAJJADI SARAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAJJADI SARAVI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2017 to 02 Jan 2018
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 09 Oct 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 10 Oct 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 09 Oct 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2019 |