THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:28:05 AM
Hoydonckx, Yasmine Marie E
CPSO#:
113508
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English, French
Education: Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: 4166035622
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Belgium
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Oct 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 13 Sep 2017
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2019 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2026 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2022 |
|
Active |