THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 19:55:55 PM
Meschino, Celine Nadege
CPSO#:
113247
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2017
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CELINE NADEGE MESCHINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MESCHINO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
AVP - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2022 |