THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:52:12 AM
Quinn, Matthew Patrick
CPSO#:
112764
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2017
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital
Eye Institute
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 613 737 8575
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW PATRICK QUINN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUINN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Aug 2023
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2022 |