THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:41:56 PM
Maxwell, Robert Brendan
CPSO#:
112761
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2017
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners St E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT BRENDAN MAXWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAXWELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 12 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 12 Mar 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 May 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2022 |