THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:57:47 AM
McDowall, Adam Scott
CPSO#:
112713
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2017
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
20 Emma Street
Chatham ON N7L 5K5
Phone: 519-354-2172
Fax: 866-539-6714
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jul 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADAM SCOTT MCDOWALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCDOWALL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 29 Jul 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2019 |