THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 18:59:21 PM
Rashid, Aisha
CPSO#:
112513
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Peshawar, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
SUITE 314
460 SPRINGBANK DRIVE
London ON N6J 0A8
Phone: 5196728364
Fax: 5196720607
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AISHA RASHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASHID is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jun 2017 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 15 Jun 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2019 |