THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:09:51 PM
Harper, Kelly Caroline
CPSO#:
112129
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Apr 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2017
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
501 Smyth Road
General Campus
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KELLY CAROLINE HARPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARPER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2023 |