THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:07:13 PM
Rathbone, Alasdair Timothy Llewelyn
CPSO#:
112088
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Western University, 2017
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
339-291 Windermere Rd
CNS Department
London ON N6G 2J9
Phone: 6135196737
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALASDAIR TIMOTHY LLEWELYN RATHBONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATHBONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Western University, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2022 |