THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:08:53 AM
Lounsbury, Elizabeth Medland
CPSO#:
112004
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Dec 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Irish, Sarah Elizabeth Medland (used until: 07 Nov 2019 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2017
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
89 Norman St
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
Phone: 519-464-4400
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Dec 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MEDLAND LOUNSBURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUNSBURY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Dec 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 2022 |