THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 1:33:43 AM
Rudy, Andrea Marie
CPSO#:
111823
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2016
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rugged Shores Family Health Team
60 Bowes St
Suite 101
Parry Sound ON P2A 2L3
Phone: (705) 746-2181
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jul 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREA MARIE RUDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUDY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 29 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 30 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2019 to 28 Jul 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2019 |