THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:01:40 AM
Lemos, Nucelio Luiz de Barros Moreira
CPSO#:
111421
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Mar 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Jan 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: Faculdade De Ciencias Medicas Da Sta: Ca, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Avenue, Room 8-917
OPG Building
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4991
Fax: (416) 586-4654
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:27 Jan 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jan 2017 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 04 Nov 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Sep 2017 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Mar 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Mar 2021 |
|
Active |