THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:04:37 AM
Peralta, Crystal Grace
CPSO#:
111319
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
03 Jan 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. Matthew's University, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5-2880 Queen St E
CompassCare Medical & Walk In Clini
Brampton ON L6S 6E8
Phone: 905-863-1466
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Crystal Peralta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 10 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Jan 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jan 2017 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2018 |
|
Active |