THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 9:48:09 AM
Nourian, Pejman
CPSO#:
111289
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Nov 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Nov 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Islamic Azad University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Westway Medical Clinic
4-1723 Kipling Ave
Etobicoke ON M9R 4E1
Phone: (647) 748-8011
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 May 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PEJMAN NOURIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOURIAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Dec 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 20 Dec 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Apr 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Nov 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 2017 |