THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:12:28 PM
Behzadi, Arian
CPSO#:
111266
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1225 Kennedy Rd
Unit J
Scarborough ON M1P 4Y1
Phone: 4164318135
Fax: 4164318233
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARIAN BEHZADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHZADI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2017 to 07 Apr 2017
EL - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2017 to 17 Nov 2017
EL - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Aug 2021
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Apr 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Nov 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |