THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:58:28 AM
Khan, Muhammad Azam
CPSO#:
111244
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Oct 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Dow Medical College, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
A-1329 Windsor Ave
Windsor ON N8X 3L8
Phone: 519-977-0777
Fax: 519-253-6682
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
New Brunswick
Pakistan
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Aug 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD AZAM KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Dec 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 13 Dec 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 May 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2021 |