THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:30:09 PM
Ashraf, Hossain Saied
CPSO#:
111173
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
19 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Univ of North Texas at Fort Worth (TCOM), 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Nov 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 13 May 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Apr 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jun 2018 |