THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 13:43:20 PM
Mehrabian, Pezhman
CPSO#:
111117
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Oct 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Pain Clinic (TPC)
Unit C8
2 Champagne Drive
North York ON M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 398-1515
Fax: (416) 398-1516
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pain Medicine |
Effective:25 Oct 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Oct 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 24 Apr 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2018 |
|
Active |