THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:47:21 AM
Onunkwo, Ifeanyi Kodilinye Ugochukwu
CPSO#:
110977
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Apr 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Apr 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Nigeria, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
272 Oxford St W
Serenity Medical Centre
London ON N6H 1S9
Phone: 5196014999
Fax: 5196014997
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Oct 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IFEANYI KODILINYE UGOCHUKWU ONUNKWO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONUNKWO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Sep 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Apr 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2017 |