THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:16:01 PM
Bisleri, Gianluigi
CPSO#:
110967
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
01 Jan 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: Universita Degli Studi de Brescia, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond Street
Division of Cardiac Surgery
Bond 8th Floor
St, Michael's Hospital
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 416 864 3065
Fax: 416 864 3049
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GIANLUIGI BISLERI may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. BISLERI holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. BISLERI may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BISLERI no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. BISLERI no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. BISLERI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Oct 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2021 |