THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:52:25 AM
Clifford, Matthew Sean Akira
CPSO#:
110896
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
348 Lyndoch Street
Corunna ON N0N 1G0
Phone: (519) 862-1461
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Sep 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Sep 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 08 Mar 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jan 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Aug 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Aug 2021 |
|
Active |