THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 22:49:18 PM
Grau Alvaro, Juan Bernardino
CPSO#:
110759
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Mar 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad de Alcala de Henares, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
3403 - 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7291
Fax: (613) 696-7117
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Juan Grau Alvaro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New Jersey
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:18 Aug 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Aug 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Aug 2019 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 16 Mar 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Mar 2021 |
|
Active |