THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:49:17 PM
Ugwunze, Nnamdi Ugochukwu
CPSO#:
110668
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Mar 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ibo
Education: University of Lagos, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1001 Queen St W
Centre for Addiction and Mental Hea
Forensic Service, Complex Care & Re
Unit 4, Fourth Floor, Room 453
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: 416 535 8501 Ext. 34389
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:13 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NNAMDI UGOCHUKWU UGWUNZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UGWUNZE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Mar 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2019 |