THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 14:23:10 PM
Sabesan, Priyadharshini
CPSO#:
110560
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Rajah Muthiah Medical College, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Priyadharshini Sabesan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 7 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:London health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital & Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East, Room C1-700
P.O. Box 5010, Stn B
London, Ontario
N6A 5W9
Date Received: 07 Jun 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jul 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2022 |