THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 6:55:37 AM
O'Keeffe, Michael Ezra
CPSO#:
110472
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Department of Medical Imaging
203 McCaul Street, 4th Floor
Toronto ON M5T 1W7
Phone: (416) 978-0513
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:25 May 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2016 to 31 May 2017
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2017 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 31 May 2024 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 May 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 May 2023 |
|
Active |