THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:19:35 AM
Al Ka'abi, Said Salim Abdullah
CPSO#:
110403
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medi, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Sep 2016
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |