THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:45:03 AM
AlQaderi, Aishah E A M
CPSO#:
110282
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Feb 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Feb 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:27 Feb 2024 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Aug 2016
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 26 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 26 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 26 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 26 Aug 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Jul 2022
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2024 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 26 Feb 2027 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |