THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 1:03:12 AM
Janic, Katarina
CPSO#:
110044
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2016
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
University of Toronto
263 McCaul St., 4th Floor
Toronto ON M5T 1W7
Phone: 4169786801
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:27 Aug 2023 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATARINA JANIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 May 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 31 May 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 May 2023
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 31 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 01 Oct 2023
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2024 to 27 Aug 2024
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine
University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
PostGrad Yr 7 - Nuclear Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2023 |