THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 14:48:08 PM
Thain, Elizabeth Jennifer
CPSO#:
109855
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Oct 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Nottingham, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
550 Wellington Road
Room A2 124 - P O Box 5777 Stn B
Parkwood Institute
St. Joseph's Healthcare
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: 519 646 6100 Ext. 42093
Fax: 519 685 4093
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Oct 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:01 Oct 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Sep 2016
PEAP - CF - Geriatric Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Geriatric Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
CF - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |