THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:47:34 PM
Golbafian, Faegheh
CPSO#:
109533
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Casselman Medical Centre
629 Principale St.
Casselman ON K0A 1M0
Phone: (613) 764-5440
Fax: (613)764-9974
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FAEGHEH GOLBAFIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLBAFIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Sep 2016
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2018 |