THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:40:35 PM
Hart, Corban Robert Bryson
CPSO#:
109526
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Oct 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 100
Richmond ON K0A 2Z0
Phone: 343-600-5855
Fax: 855-807-2498
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:23 Jul 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CORBAN ROBERT BRYSON HART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HART is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2018 |