THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
11/05/24 8:16:36 AM
Hasan, Wael F H
CPSO#:
109440
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Nov 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1B7
Phone: 519 397 1865
Fax: 519 380 9598
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:07 Oct 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WAEL F H HASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Sep 2016
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2022 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 28 Sep 2025 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2022 |