THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 5:08:16 AM
Zung, Jeremy David
CPSO#:
109324
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Aug 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2016
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
401-1110 Sheppard Ave E
NeuroCare - Neurology, Neurophysiol
North York ON M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 224-1922
Fax: (416) 224-0056
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
University Health Network |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEREMY DAVID ZUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2021 |