THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:06:23 PM
Sun, Gavin Robert
CPSO#:
109215
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: 705 728 9802
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology |
Effective:24 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GAVIN ROBERT SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2016 |